Ward-Smith, Rosalind Antonia (CPSO#: 72349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Burlington Medical Centre
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 319-2000
Fax: (905) 319-6292
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSALIND ANTONIA WARD-SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD-SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2000