Wardell, Gaylord Clifford (CPSO#: 67242)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2002