Warder, Lindsay Erin (CPSO#: 91121)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: McLean, Lindsay Erin (used until: 03 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 707 Moss Street Victoria, BC V8V 4N9
Date Received: 06 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2015