Wardill, James Campbell (CPSO#: 19633)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cambridge, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000