Wardle, Andrew Peter Bruce Dannatt (CPSO#: 28327)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Wardle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 69 Birkbank Drive Oakville, ON L6J 4Z1
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015