Wardle, David Lee James (CPSO#: 57264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
6 Cataraqui Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1Z7
Phone: (613) 417-1969
Fax: (613) 767-6638
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Wardle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wardle ( CPSO# 57264 )

Business Address:
Prestige Cosmetic Surgery
Suite 112
6 Cataraqui Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1Z7
Phone Number: (613) 417-1969

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LEE JAMES WARDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARDLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989