Wark, Sheryl Catherine (CPSO#: 95502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mountdale Family Health Clinic
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5R8
Phone: (807) 577-5676
Fax: (807) 577-7911
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807)684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Fairway Physiotherapy -Sport Med
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5R8
Canada
Phone: (807)344-5242
Fax: (807)344-5042
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL CATHERINE WARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2015