Warkentin, Theodore Earl (CPSO#: 52483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences - Lab Med
Hamilton General Hospital
Hematology, Room 1-270B
237 Barton Street East, Level 1
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46139
Fax: (905) 577-1421
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE EARL WARKENTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARKENTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Research Fellows - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986