Warner, Leonard Charles (CPSO#: 54147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Medical Centre
Suite 207
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 764-0333
Fax: (905) 764-7712
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Warner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Warner ( CPSO# 54147 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Medical Centre
Suite 207
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone Number: (905) 764-0333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD CHARLES WARNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985