Warner, Margaret Nancy (CPSO#: 68560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital, Glen site
1001 Decarie
Room E04.1818
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 36138
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montreal Children's Hospital
1001 Decarie
Montreal Quebec
H3A 3J1
Montreal QC  H3A 3J1
Canada
Phone: (514) 412-4420
County: 
Electoral District: 

Montreal Children's Hospital
1001 Decarie
Montreal Quebec
H3A 3J1
Montreal QC  H3A 3J1
Canada
Phone: (514) 412-4420
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET NANCY WARNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Oct 1994 to 20 Nov 1994
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1996