Warnes, Hector (CPSO#: 31822)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian, Spanish

Education:National University of Tucuman, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 1991
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 1992

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Sep 1991
Summary:

 In May 1991, Dr. Warnes pleaded guilty to the charges in the Notice of Hearing.  The Discipline 
 Committee accepted this plea and in September 1991 found Dr. Warnes guilty of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed 
 sexual impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Warnes' licence 
 to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 14 Dec 1992
Hearing Date(s): 23 May 1991