Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Warnica, John Keith (CPSO#: 17578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 222 Steel St Unit 14 Barrie, ON L4M 2G9
Date Received: 11 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017