Warnock, Thomas Frame (CPSO#: 30579)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014