Warrack, Ian Mcarthur (CPSO#: 22260)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting medical records may email iwarrack@gmail.com.
Date Received: 19 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017