Warren, Elizabeth Janet (CPSO#: 60836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Urban Core CHC
71 Rebecca St
Hamilton ON  L8R 1B6
Phone: (905) 522-3233
Fax: 905-522-3433
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bayridge Family Centre
1295 North Service Rd
Burlington ON  L7R 4M2
Canada
Phone: 905-319-1488
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Bayridge Counselling Centre
845 Harrington Cr. Unit 200A
Burlington ON  L7N 3P3
Canada
Phone: 905-319-1488
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANET WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1990