Warren, Heather Mary (CPSO#: 86288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Warren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Warren ( CPSO# 86288 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's Regional Cardiac Care Centre
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
206 - 460 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER MARY WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jun 2007 to 01 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010