Warren, John Peake (CPSO#: 22149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Mar 1976

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
255 Midland Avenue
Midland ON  L4R 3K3
Phone: (705) 527-2754
Fax: (705) 528-0004
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1976

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 1976 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. John P.  Warren may not prescribe, purchase, or possess narcotic drugs and
            preparations.