Warren, Ralph Edward Cargill (CPSO#: 21287)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact: Toronto GI Clinic Suite 450 5 Fairview Mall Drive Toronto, ON M2J 2Z1 Tel: (416) 322-7517
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012