Warren, Rex Christopher (CPSO#: 52853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthews-Warren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200


Corporation Name: Dr. Terry Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hayward ( CPSO# 95251 )
Dr. D. Gateman ( CPSO# 100625)
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )
Dr. P. Rutherford ( CPSO# 19820 )
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 58128 )
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )
Dr. R. Latuskie ( CPSO# 66312 )
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )
Dr. R. Annis ( CPSO# 59933 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200


Corporation Name: B.A. Matthews Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REX CHRISTOPHER WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984