Warshafsky, Chelsie Lauren (CPSO#: 111265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 07 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHELSIE LAUREN WARSHAFSKY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WARSHAFSKY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. WARSHAFSKY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WARSHAFSKY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WARSHAFSKY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WARSHAFSKY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WARSHAFSKY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 12 Feb 2017
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017