Warshawski, Frank John (CPSO#: 30093)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Alberta, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Oct 1990