Wasan, Santosh Madanlal (CPSO#: 24132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Bombay, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 807
225 Merton Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3H1
Phone: (416) 481-8869
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANTOSH MADANLAL WASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1971