Wasan, Tina (CPSO#: 66808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
178 Main Street
Unit 102
Unionville ON  L3R 2G9
Phone: (905) 475-9100
Fax: (905) 475-9102
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA WASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995