Waseemoddin, (CPSO#: 111284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 27 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 73502
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASEEMODDIN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. WASEEMODDIN is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. WASEEMODDIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WASEEMODDIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WASEEMODDIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. WASEEMODDIN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. WASEEMODDIN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Dec 2016 to 26 Feb 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2018