Waslen, Gregory Dennis (CPSO#: 31226)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2006