Wassef, Georgina (CPSO#: 69917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
876 Montreal Road
Unit E
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone: (613) 742-8182
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Georgina Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wassef ( CPSO# 69917 )

Business Address:
Suite E
876 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L3
Phone Number: (613) 742-8182

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGINA WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998