Wassef, Hanaa Shoukri Nassif (CPSO#: 88080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Minya, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical clinic
Unit 09
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 235-6733
Fax: (905) 235-8933
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CityMed Medical Centre
110 Brickyard Way
unit 6
Brampton ON  L6V 4N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 457-1666
Fax: (905) 457-4666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanaa Wassef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wassef ( CPSO# 88080 )

Business Address:
6 - 110 Brickyard Way
Brampton ON  L6V 4N1
Phone Number: (905) 457-1666

Business Address:
Medical Clinic
Unit 09
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 235-6733

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANAA SHOUKRI NASSIF WASSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2008