Wasserman, Jeffrey Jacob (CPSO#: 59977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Wasserman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wasserman ( CPSO# 59977 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JACOB WASSERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988