Wasserman, Jonathan Daniel (CPSO#: 88468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Endocrinology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228186
Fax: (416) 813-6304
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jonathan Daniel Wasserman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Endocrinology, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Wasserman holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Wasserman no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Wasserman's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives an
                        annual report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Wasserman's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2012 and automatically expires on
                  June 30, 2019, in acordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.