Wassermann, Samuel Josef (CPSO#: 56890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Jun 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., January 11, 2013, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Samuel Josef Wasserman:

            (i)   Dr. Wassermann shall practise only in a group practise environment
            approved by the College;

            (ii)  Dr. Wassermann shall ensure that the Director, Chief of Staff, office
            manager or other person in a comparable role who is acceptable to the College,
            at each location at which he practices (the "Reporting Director(s)"), sign an
            undertaking in the form attached to the Order as Appendix A, and that the
            Reporting Director(s) report to the College on a quarterly basis in respect of
            Dr. Wassermann's office and practise management, his administrative and
            organizational performance and his communication/interactions with patients and
            colleagues;

            (iii) If a Reporting Director who has given an Undertaking is unwilling or
            unable to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Wassermann shall, within 30 days,
            obtain an Undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the
            College;

            (iv)  If Dr. Wassermann is unable to obtain a Reporting Director at a location
            at which he practices as set out in (ii) or (iii) above, Dr. Wassermann shall
            cease to practice at that location immediately until such time as he has
            obtained a Reporting Director at that location;

            (v)   Dr. Wassermann shall undergo a preceptorship (the "Preceptorship") under
            the supervision of a preceptor acceptable to the College (the "Preceptor"), who
            shall sign an Undertaking in the form attached to the Order as Appendix "B",
            such Preceptorship to include,

                  a.    For the first 6 months, monthly chart reviews of 25 patient charts
                  from all practise locations, selected by the Preceptor in his/her sole
                  discretion, monthly meetings for discussion of any concerns and
                  recommendations of the preceptor, and monthly reports to the College -
                  the first preceptorship meeting to take place within two weeks of the
                  preceptorship commencing;

                  b.    After the first 6 months of the Preceptorship, if the preceptor
                  believes it appropriate and reports the basis for this belief to the
                  College, the number of charts reviewed may be decreased to 10
                  charts/month for a further 6 months, with monthly meetings for discussion
                  of any concerns and recommendations of the preceptor, and monthly reports
                  to the College; 
                  
            (vi)  If Dr. Wassermann's Preceptor is unwilling or unable to continue to
            fulfill the terms of this Order and Appendix "B" hereto, Dr. Wassermann shall,
            within twenty (20) days, obtain an Undertaking in the same form from a person
            who is acceptable to the College, failing which Dr. Wassermann shall
            immediately cease practice until this requirement is satisfied;

            (vii) Dr. Wassermann shall continue his participation in, and full compliance
            with, the Physician Health Program ("PHP"), and he shall ensure that the PHP
            provides the College quarterly reports regarding his compliance, progress, and
            any recommendations regarding his practise (including any changes in
            recommendation as to the amount of time Dr. Wassermann should spend in
            practise);

            (viii)Following the completion of the Preceptorship, Dr. Wassermann shall
            undergo a Comprehensive Practise Assessment by an assessor or assessors
            appointed by the College (the "Assessor(s)");

            (ix)  Dr. Wassermann shall abide by any and all recommendations of his
            Reporting Director(s), the Preceptor(s), the PHP, and the Assessors, including
            with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional
            development and/or education;

            (x)   Nothing in this Order shall alter or detract from Dr. Wassermann's
            obligations pursuant to the College's policy on Re-entering Practice, or such
            equivalent policies as may apply to Dr. Wassermann in the future; and

            (xi)  Dr. Wassermann shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and
            expenses associated with his compliance with the terms of this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Jan 2013
Summary:

      On January 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Samuel Josef Wassermann 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Wassermann admitted 
the allegations.  
 
Dr. Wasserman temporarily closed his practice around December 18, 2009. Between November 
2008 and March 2011, seventeen patients made repeated requests for their medical records. Dr. 
Wassermann failed to respond in a timely manner. In June 2011, Dr. Wasserman transferred his 
medical records to a medical records storage service, Record Storage and Retrieval Services 
("RSRS"). By March 21, 2012, after contact by a College investigator, Dr. Wasserman arranged 
for sixteen of the patients to receive their records and advised one of the patients that those 
records were missing. 
 
Based on an investigation, the College's independent expert's opinion was that Dr. Wassermann 
failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of 23 patients and exposed 
these patients to risk of harm, including:   inadequate medical record keeping; failure to 
document rationale for certain tests andcomment on certain results; various prescribing issues; 
failure to follow up certain clinical indications and test results; repeated failure to adequately 
monitor patients' blood pressure; inappropriate management of a patient's migraine with 
sedatives; inadequate management of anemia. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wassermann's 
certificate of registration: 
 
(i)   Dr. Wassermann shall practise only in a group practise environment approved by the 
            College. 
  
(ii)  Dr. Wassermann shall ensure that the Director, Chief of Staff, office manager or other 
person in a comparable role who is acceptable to the College, at each location at which he 
practices (the "Reporting Director(s)"), sign an undertaking in the form attached to the Order as 
Appendix A, and that the Reporting Director(s) report to the College on a quarterly basis in 
respect of Dr. Wassermann's office and practise management, his administrative and 
organizational performance and his communication/interactions with patients and colleagues; 
 
(iii) If a Reporting Director who has given an Undertaking is unwilling or unable to continue to 
fulfill its terms, Dr. Wassermann shall, within 30 days, obtain an Undertaking in the same form 
from a person who is acceptable to the College; 
 
(iv) If Dr. Wassermann is unable to obtain a Reporting Director at a location at which he 
practices as set out in (ii) or (iii) above, Dr. Wassermann shall cease to practice at that location 
immediately until such time as he has obtained a Reporting Director at that location; 
  
(v) Dr. Wassermann shall undergo a preceptorship (the "Preceptorship") under the supervision of 
a preceptor acceptable to the College (the "Preceptor"), who shall sign an Undertaking in the 
form attached to the Order as Appendix "B", such Preceptorship to include, 
  
      a. For the first 6 months, monthly chart reviews of 25 patient charts from all practise 
      locations, selected by the Preceptor in his/her sole discretion, monthly meetings for 
      discussion of any concerns and recommendations of the preceptor, and monthly reports to 
      the College - the first preceptorship meeting to take place within two weeks of the 
      preceptorship commencing; 
  
      b. After the first 6 months of the Preceptorship, if the preceptor believes it appropriate 
      and reports the basis for this belief to the College, the number of charts reviewed may be 
      decreased to 10 charts/month for a further 6 months, with monthly meetings for 
      discussion of any concerns and recommendations of the preceptor, and monthly reports to 
      the College; 
  
(vi) If Dr. Wassermann's Preceptor is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfill the terms of this 
Order and Appendix "B" hereto, Dr. Wassermann shall, within twenty (20) days, obtain an 
Undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the College, failing which Dr. 
Wassermann shall immediately cease practice until this requirement is satisfied; 
  
(vii) Dr. Wassermann shall continue his participation in, and full compliance with, the Physician 
Health Program ("PHP"), and he shall ensure that the PHP provides the College quarterly reports 
regarding his compliance, progress, and any recommendations regarding his practise (including 
any changes in recommendation as to the amount of time Dr. Wassermann should spend in 
practise); 
  
(viii) Following the completion of the Preceptorship, Dr. Wassermann shall undergo a 
Comprehensive Practise Assessment by an assessor or assessors appointed by the College (the 
"Assessor(s)"); 
  
(ix) Dr. Wassermann shall abide by any and all recommendations of his Reporting Director(s), 
the Preceptor(s), the PHP, and the Assessors, including with respect to any practice 
improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education; 
  
(x)   Nothing in this Order shall alter or detract from Dr. Wassermann's obligations pursuant to 
the College's policy on Re-entering Practice, or such equivalent policies as may apply to Dr. 
Wassermann in the future; and 
 
(xi) Dr. Wassermann shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with 
his compliance with the terms of this Order.  
 
2. Dr. Wassermann attend before this panel to be reprimanded. 
 
3. Dr. Wassermann pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the 
date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal