Wasylyk, Roman Yaroslaw (CPSO#: 66664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7600
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMAN YAROSLAW WASYLYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASYLYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995