Watada, Brian Hideki (CPSO#: 70157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Commercial Street Medical Centre
Suite 202
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 876-2021
Fax: (905) 876-2507
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Watada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Watada ( CPSO# 70157 )

Business Address:
202 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 876-2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN HIDEKI WATADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATADA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998