Watanabe Duffy, Karen Nobuko (CPSO#: 57247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: Watanabe, Karen Nobuko (used until: 13 Nov 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1015
Fax: (613) 738-4297
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN NOBUKO WATANABE DUFFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATANABE DUFFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1990