Watanabe, Sharon Mariko (CPSO#: 59809)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2001