Waterfall, William Ernest (CPSO#: 42187)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007