Waterman, Fern Kayla Kopstick (CPSO#: 24914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Other

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 20, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Fern Kayla Kopstick
            Waterman, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Waterman
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Waterman has voluntarily ceased to practice medicine in all jurisdictions.


            As from September 10, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Fern Kayla Kopstick
            Waterman, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Waterman
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Waterman is prohibited from accepting any new patients into her practice.

            Dr. Waterman is prohibited from prescribing any drug or substance for which a
            prescription is required. 

            Dr. Waterman shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all her
            Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Waterman must not prescribe
            any drug or substance for which a prescription is required. Further information
            may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
            www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language in which Dr.
            Waterman provides services and posted in the waiting rooms of all her Practice
            Locations, in a clearly visible location.