Waterman, Nadia Josee (CPSO#: 97234)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Chisasibi Hospital Chisasibi, QC J0M 1E0
Date Received: 15 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014