Waters, Heather Margaret (CPSO#: 71136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-7757
Fax: (905) 575-7831
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maternity Centre of Hamilton
McMaster Family Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
100 Main Street West, 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 28938
Fax: (905) 528-3899
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER MARGARET WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2000