Waters, Paul Frederick (CPSO#: 27425)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1988