Watkin, Daniel (CPSO#: 64760)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Paul Sabatier University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Watkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2013

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 12, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 18, 2011, Collingwood General & Marine Hospital notified the College that Dr. Daniel Watkins’s privileges were revoked, effective March 12, 2011.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 1, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notice from Collingwood General and Marine Hospital of a suspension and restriction of privileges held by Dr. Daniel Watkin. The suspension is for three months, effective February 1, 2010.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 21, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Daniel Watkin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Daniel Watkin:

1.Certificate of registration number 64760, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

2.Acknowledge that I may be the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession and whether I am incompetent in the practice of medicine related to complying with the Specified Education or Remediation Program ordered by the Inquires, Complaints and Reports Committee dated October 5, 2011.

3.Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Investigation were not proven before the Discipline Committee.

4.Hereby resign from the College effective October 7th, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).

5.Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

6.Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician or in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with an Investigation it terminated as a result of this undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

12. Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.