Watkins, John Frederick (CPSO#: 61869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Plastic Surgery
Brock 3 - Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2300
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F Watkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Watkins ( CPSO# 61869 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
S3 - 166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK WATKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999