Watling, Christopher John (CPSO#: 62069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
Western University
Room MSB 103 Medical Science Bldg
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: (519) 661-2019
Fax: (519) 850-2492
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN WATLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATLING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1991