Watson, Ann Elizabeth West (CPSO#: 56527)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1989