Watson, Christopher Herbert Charles (CPSO#: 28136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 416-523-5158
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request to drchriswatson@gmail.com
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HERBERT CHARLES WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1979