Watson, Christopher Peter North (CPSO#: 21002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
878 Browns line
Toronto ON  M8W3W2
Phone: 4165030015
Fax: 4165032082
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 25, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher Peter
            North Watson in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Watson
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR.  CHRISTOPHER PETER NORTH WATSON
                                          ("Dr. Watson") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Watson, certificate of registration number 21002, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that the College received information from the
                  NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 425423 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that I executed an Undertaking dated October
                  17, 2017 in resolution of the Investigation. That Undertaking provided
                  for clinical supervision of my prescribing of controlled substances
                  including narcotics and for a subsequent reassessment of this area of my
                  practice. After entering into that Undertaking, I closed my pain
                  practice. As a result, I no longer prescribe controlled substances
                  including narcotics and do not have any practice in this area for
                  supervision or reassessment. I acknowledge that this Undertaking
                  supercedes the October 17, 2017 Undertaking.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

                  (a)   I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Watson, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or
                        renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                        substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27);
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D"); 
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Watson, warrant that I have referred all patients to whom I
                        had previously prescribed any of the substances described in
                        section (6)(c), above, to other physicians for assessment and care.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (6)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (8)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (9)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) and in each examination and consulting room, in all my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "E." For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows:
                  
                                                IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Watson must not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following:
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (9)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "E."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (9)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Watson, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (9)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (9)(d).

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information from the Narcotics
                              Monitoring System about Dr. Watson's prescribing of
                              controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                              investigation into whether Dr. Watson failed to maintain the
                              standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent
                              in his prescribing of controlled substances, including
                              narcotics.

                              As a result of the investigation, Dr. Watson entered into an
                              Undertaking in 2017 for clinical supervision of his
                              prescribing of controlled substances including narcotics and
                              for a subsequent reassessment of this area of his practice.
                              After entering into that Undertaking, Dr. Watson closed his
                              pain practice. As he no longer prescribes controlled
                              substances including narcotics, he does not have any practice
                              in this area for supervision or reassessment. Dr. Watson
                              accordingly signed a new Undertaking in 2018 providing that
                              he must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                              prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                              substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27);
                  
                              (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                    Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c.
                                    22);
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                              Dr. Watson must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all
                              Practice Locations, which states as follows:
                  
                                                IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Watson must not prescribe or administer any of the
                                    following:
                                    -     Narcotic Drugs
                                    -     Narcotic Preparations
                                    -     Controlled Drugs
                                    -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -     All other Monitored Drugs

                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Watson, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Watson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Watson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (20)  I, Dr. Watson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
See PDF for the summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Peter North Watson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2018.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)