Watson, Diane Beverly (CPSO#: 24116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Lawrence Valley Correctional
And Treatment Centre
Box 5000
1804 Highway 2E
Brockville ON  K6V 7N2
Phone: (613) 341-2870 Ext. 1337
Fax: (613) 341-2884
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

#3 831 Bronson Ave
Ottawa ON  K1S4G5
Canada
Phone: 613 749 8008
Fax: 613 4829540
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Watson ( CPSO# 24116 )

Business Address:
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 7N2
Phone Number: (613) 341-2870

Business Address:
3 - 831 Bronson Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 4G5
Phone Number: (613) 749-8008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE BEVERLY WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2005