Watson, Hilary Anne (CPSO#: 79380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Hendrie, Hilary Anne (used until: 27 Aug 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hilary Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Watson ( CPSO# 79380 )

Business Address:
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY ANNE WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005