Watson, Iain Scott (CPSO#: 66828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1251 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville ON  K2S 2E5
Phone: (613) 831-7372
Fax: (613) 831-6381
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

375 Daniel St S
Arnprior ON  K2S 3K6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-7773
Fax: (613) 623-5563
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

6081 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON  K2S 1B9
Canada
Phone: (613) 831-1514
Fax: (613) 831-1574
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1831 Robertson Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 828-3746
Fax: (613) 828-3855
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1309 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L3
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-5670
Fax: (613) 722-9421
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Iain Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 15 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Iain Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Watson ( CPSO# 66828 )

Business Address:
1251 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville ON  K2S 2E5
Phone Number: (613) 831-7372

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAIN SCOTT WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995