Watson, John Brown (CPSO#: 55798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital
General Site - CCW1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Site
Suite B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4169
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.B. Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Watson ( CPSO# 55798 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital - General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Site
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4940

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oregon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN BROWN WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1991