Watson, Kenneth Randal (CPSO#: 52685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 615-9285
Fax: (905) 615-8537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Randal Watson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Watson ( CPSO# 52685 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 615-9285

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Toronto ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH RANDAL WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1986